AZ HB2549 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic; digital devices; stalking; threatening
Title
Electronic; digital devices; stalking; threatening
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Campbell [D] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Anna Tovar [D] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Rep. Victor Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (52-6-2-0) | |
2012-04-03 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-02 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |