AZ HB2551 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-32-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-32-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; bonds; overrides; funding sources
Title
Schools; bonds; overrides; funding sources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-32-1-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0-0) |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |