AZ HB2563 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-06 - Referred to Senate ED Committee
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-06 - Referred to Senate ED Committee
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher preparation programs; common core
Title
Teacher preparation programs; common core
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-21-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |