AZ HB2579 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Video service; certificates of authority
Title
Video service; certificates of authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-18-5-0) |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-13 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |