AZ HB2592 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Justice of the peace; residency
Title
Justice of the peace; residency
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] |
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Governor Vetoed | |
2015-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |