AZ HB2593 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate NRE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate NRE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mining advisory council; repeal
Title
Mining advisory council; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |