AZ HB2601 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing; credit; electronic monitoring
Title
Sentencing; credit; electronic monitoring
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House CJR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Assigned to House CJR Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |