AZ HB2610 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Budget stabilization fund; cap; repeal
Title
Budget stabilization fund; cap; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-4-2-1-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |