AZ HB2612 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; trauma recovery center fund
Title
Appropriation; trauma recovery center fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |