AZ HB2618 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal taxes; auditors
Title
Municipal taxes; auditors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-10 | House read second time | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |