AZ HB2619 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fund transfer; Arizona historical society
Title
Fund transfer; Arizona historical society
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (45-15-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House ENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House ENR Committee | |
2011-02-08 | House read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House ENR Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |