AZ HB2628 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health care insurance; amendments
Title
Health care insurance; amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 111 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2318 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2320 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 827 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |