AZ HB2631 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State capitol restoration recapture district
Title
State capitol restoration recapture district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-29 | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-02 | House read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in House and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=HB2631 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/hb2631p.htm |