AZ HB2631 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-24 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-24 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax; aircraft; foreign governments
Title
Tax; aircraft; foreign governments
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Senate FIN Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-3-1-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-10 | House read second time | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |