AZ HB2631 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; local boards; duties; consolidation
Title
PSPRS; local boards; duties; consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Corp
Corrections Officer Retirement Plan
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Corrections Officer Retirement Plan
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 802.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 893.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |