AZ HB2645 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rest area maintenance; ADOT agreements
Title
Rest area maintenance; ADOT agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Hold | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |