AZ HB2658 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Flood control authority; relinquishment; districts
Title
Flood control authority; relinquishment; districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House final reading , voting: (49-10-1-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-04 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-9-3-0) | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-09 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2012-01-26 | House read second time | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |