AZ HB2668 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrition assistance; benefit match; appropriation.
Title
Nutrition assistance; benefit match; appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel John [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Charlene Fernandez [D] | Rep. Joanne Osborne [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-19-1-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |