AZ HB2707 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
General fund revenue limit
Title
General fund revenue limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (38-22-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-11-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-4-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | House third reading , voting: (36-23-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House read second time | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time |