AZ HB2713 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona longterm care trust
Title
Arizona longterm care trust
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-01 | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2012-05-01 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-18 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-18 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-13 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2012-03-06 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |