AZ HB2727 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; merchant category codes; prohibition
Title
Firearms; merchant category codes; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6
Enforcement
Financial Institutions
Firearms
Merchant Category Codes
Prohibition
Enforcement
Financial Institutions
Firearms
Merchant Category Codes
Prohibition