AZ HB2771 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - House TRANS Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - House TRANS Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
HURF monies; accounting; appropriation
Title
HURF monies; accounting; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | House TRANS Committee action: Discussed and Held | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=107&Bill_Number=HB2771 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2771p.htm |