AZ HB2866 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House third reading FAILED voting: (35-24-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House third reading FAILED voting: (35-24-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electric vehicles; registration fee
Title
Electric vehicles; registration fee
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (35-24-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-2-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Electric Vehicles
Registration Fees
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Transportation - Title 28
Two-thirds Vote
Vehicle Registration
Registration Fees
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment)
Transportation - Title 28
Two-thirds Vote
Vehicle Registration