AZ HB2900 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1738
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commerce; 2024-2025
Title
Commerce; 2024-2025
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2900 substituted for SB 1738. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2900 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2900 substituted for SB 1738. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-15 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2900 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Chapter 212 |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2900 substituted for SB 1738. Motion carried. |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-06-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-06-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2024-06-15 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-06-15 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-06-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-06-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-06-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-06-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-06-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0) |
2024-06-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-7-1-0-0-0) |
2024-06-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-06-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-06-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1738 (Replaces) 2024-06-15 - Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
2024-2025
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6
Commerce
Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions (difi)
Department Revolving Fund
Difi (see Also: Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions)
Effective Date
Fraud Unit Assessment Fund
Highways And Bridges - Title 18
Insurance - Title 20
Microbusiness Loan Program
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6
Commerce
Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions (difi)
Department Revolving Fund
Difi (see Also: Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions)
Effective Date
Fraud Unit Assessment Fund
Highways And Bridges - Title 18
Insurance - Title 20
Microbusiness Loan Program
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 466 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 466.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |