AZ HCR2006 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Article V convention
Title
Article V convention
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |