AZ HCR2009 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unmanned aircraft systems
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-21 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |