AZ HCR2014 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hardrock mining industry; recognition
Title
Hardrock mining industry; recognition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-01-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-2-2-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefile |