AZ HCR2018 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Post-traumatic stress injury awareness day
Title
Post-traumatic stress injury awareness day
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Rep. Richard Andrade [D] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Jonathan Larkin [D] | Sen. Juan Mendez [D] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |