AZ HCR2048 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; teacher salary increases; reporting.
Title
Schools; teacher salary increases; reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-7-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Reporting
School Employees
Schools
Secretary Of State
Teacher Pay Fund
Teacher Salary Increases
Teachers
Reporting
School Employees
Schools
Secretary Of State
Teacher Pay Fund
Teacher Salary Increases
Teachers