AZ HR2002 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona water professionals appreciation week
Title
Arizona water professionals appreciation week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2019-04-15 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (---) |
2019-04-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |