AZ HR2002 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Securing America's lands; foreign interference
Title
Securing America's lands; foreign interference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HR2002 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |