AZ SB1003 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2273
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp; licensing; effective date
Title
Industrial hemp; licensing; effective date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Chapter 5 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Prefile |
Same As/Similar To
HB2273 (Replaces) 2019-02-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Subjects
Agricultural Licensing
Agriculture - Title 3
Arizona Department Of Agriculture
Criminal Code - Title 13
Effective Date
Emergency
Industrial Hemp
Licensing
State Government - Title 41
Agriculture - Title 3
Arizona Department Of Agriculture
Criminal Code - Title 13
Effective Date
Emergency
Industrial Hemp
Licensing
State Government - Title 41