AZ SB1014 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - House read second time
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - House read second time
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Business; discrimination prohibition; social criteria
Title
Business; discrimination prohibition; social criteria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6
Business
Business Practices
Businesses (h)
Certain Affiliations
Discrimination Prohibited
Discrimination Prohibition
Social Criteria
Statewide Concern
Trade And Commerce - Title 44 (h)
Business
Business Practices
Businesses (h)
Certain Affiliations
Discrimination Prohibited
Discrimination Prohibition
Social Criteria
Statewide Concern
Trade And Commerce - Title 44 (h)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1698.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 194 | New Code | See Bill Text |