AZ SB1029 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - House CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - House CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Psychiatric security review board; hearings
Title
Psychiatric security review board; hearings
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | House CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House CJR Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Census Data
Commitment Hearing
Conforming Legislation
Costs
Counties
Counties - Title 11
Criminal Code - Title 13
Deferral
Department Of Health Services
Dhs
Effective Date
Expedited Hearing
Expiration
Guilty Except Insane
Hearings
Hospitalization
Independent Expert Witness
Independent Oversight Committees
Insanity (h)
Jurisdiction
Mental Disorder
Mental Health (h)
Mental Health Report
Mentally Ill
Operating Costs
Opinion Evidence
Powers And Duties
Psychiatric Security Review Board
Public Defenders (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Reimbursement (h)
Release Terms
Repeal
Request
Requirements
Return
State Government - Title 41
Superior Court
Training
Transfer
Transfer Of Jurisdiction
Treatment Supervisor
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Census Data
Commitment Hearing
Conforming Legislation
Costs
Counties
Counties - Title 11
Criminal Code - Title 13
Deferral
Department Of Health Services
Dhs
Effective Date
Expedited Hearing
Expiration
Guilty Except Insane
Hearings
Hospitalization
Independent Expert Witness
Independent Oversight Committees
Insanity (h)
Jurisdiction
Mental Disorder
Mental Health (h)
Mental Health Report
Mentally Ill
Operating Costs
Opinion Evidence
Powers And Duties
Psychiatric Security Review Board
Public Defenders (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Reimbursement (h)
Release Terms
Repeal
Request
Requirements
Return
State Government - Title 41
Superior Court
Training
Transfer
Transfer Of Jurisdiction
Treatment Supervisor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 584 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3991 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3992 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3994 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3997 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3998 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3999 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4000 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4001 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4002 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4003 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 545.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3028.11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |