AZ SB1045 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - House TI Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - House TI Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
License plates; professional soccer
Title
License plates; professional soccer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House TI Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Professional Soccer Club
Highway User Revenues
License Plates (h)
Professional Soccer (h)
Special Plates
State Highway Fund
Transportation - Title 28
Highway User Revenues
License Plates (h)
Professional Soccer (h)
Special Plates
State Highway Fund
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2470.18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |