AZ SB1051 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DHS; continuation
Title
DHS; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Chapter 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3020.19 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3028.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |