AZ SB1058 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2122
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of state; appropriation; elections.
Title
Secretary of state; appropriation; elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Chapter 2 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2018-01-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Prefile |
Same As/Similar To
HB2122 (Replaces) 2018-02-07 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended