AZ SB1076 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; prostitution; employment
Title
Technical correction; prostitution; employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate final reading , voting: (18-7-5-0) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-29 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-29 | House third reading , voting: (51-0-9-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-14 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |