AZ SB1096 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health professionals data; repository
Title
Health professionals data; repository
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Tony Navarrete [D] | Rep. Kelli Butler [D] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 215 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-03-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Health Professionals
Health Professionals Data
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repository
Appropriations
Health Professionals
Health Professionals Data
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repository
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3249 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3249.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 405.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |