AZ SB1104 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; delinquent property; sale
Title
Technical correction; delinquent property; sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-4-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (16-13-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-1-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |