AZ SB1104 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Contractor licensure requirements.
Title
Contractor licensure requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |