AZ SB1121 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - House read second time
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - House read second time
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
National guard; active duty; requirements
Title
National guard; active duty; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Active Duty
Active Duty Combat
Definitions
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
National Guard
Requirements
Active Duty Combat
Definitions
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
National Guard
Requirements