AZ SB1139 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - House miscellaneous motion: Representative Martinez made a motion to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1139.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - House miscellaneous motion: Representative Martinez made a motion to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1139.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Government investments; products; fiduciaries; plans
Title
Government investments; products; fiduciaries; plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Motion Representative Martinez made a motion to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1139. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1139 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1139 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1139 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1139 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Martinez made a motion to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1139. |
2023-04-26 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1139 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. |
2023-04-13 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1139 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. |
2023-04-05 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-04-05 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-30-2-0) |
2023-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-22 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Definitions
Duties
Fiduciaries
Government Investments
Handling Of Public Funds
Investment Managers
List
Plans
Posting
Products
Public Finances - Title 35
State Investments
Voting Of Ownership Interests
Duties
Fiduciaries
Government Investments
Handling Of Public Funds
Investment Managers
List
Plans
Posting
Products
Public Finances - Title 35
State Investments
Voting Of Ownership Interests