AZ SB1157 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Small property tax balance delinquency
Title
Small property tax balance delinquency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 144 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |