AZ SB1157 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction; veteran's pensions
Title
Income tax subtraction; veteran's pensions
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-2-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Gross Income
Income Tax Subtraction
Strike Everything Amendment
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Veterans' Pensions
Income Tax Subtraction
Strike Everything Amendment
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Veterans' Pensions