AZ SB1157 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Asbestos claims; required information; liability
Title
Asbestos claims; required information; liability
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Chapter 188 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability (h)
Asbestos Claims
Asbestos Exposure
Asbestos Liability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Liability
Personal Injury Claim
Product Liability
Product Liability Action
Required Information
Sworn Statement
Third Party
Asbestos Claims
Asbestos Exposure
Asbestos Liability
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Liability
Personal Injury Claim
Product Liability
Product Liability Action
Required Information
Sworn Statement
Third Party
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 783 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 784 | New Code | See Bill Text |