AZ SB1163 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individualized investigational treatment; availability; prohibitions
Title
Individualized investigational treatment; availability; prohibitions
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Chapter 189 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-3-0) |
2022-04-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-3-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Antisense Oligonucleotides
Availability
Cause Of Action
Gene Therapy
Health Care
Health Care Institution
Health Profession Regulatory Board
Heirs
Individualized Investigational Treatment
Informed Consent
Insurance Providers
Neoantigen Vaccines
Prohibition (h)
Prohibitions
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Third-party Payors
Availability
Cause Of Action
Gene Therapy
Health Care
Health Care Institution
Health Profession Regulatory Board
Heirs
Individualized Investigational Treatment
Informed Consent
Insurance Providers
Neoantigen Vaccines
Prohibition (h)
Prohibitions
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Third-party Payors