AZ SB1165 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal taxes; auditors and collectors
Title
Municipal taxes; auditors and collectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | House third reading , voting: (45-14-1-0) | |
2011-03-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | House Consent Calendar March 21, 2011 @ 3:30 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate GR Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |