AZ SB1184 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Arizona geological survey
Title
Appropriation; Arizona geological survey
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 285 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-05-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-2-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |