AZ SB1184 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation; community services
Title
Supplemental appropriation; community services
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2157 (Replaced by) 2022-03-01 - Chapter 2
Subjects
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Appointive Officers
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Cities And Towns
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Community Services
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Supplemental Appropriation
Technical Correction
Appointive Officers
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Cities And Towns
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Community Services
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Supplemental Appropriation
Technical Correction